Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Stone, Judith Ursule, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Stone, Robert Douglas, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Maguire, Daniel P. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaguire, Daniel P. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2020 |
CategoryDv Prevention With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time146 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
FAMILY LAW Request for Order - DV/TRO HEARING RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE REQUEST Judge: Maguire, Daniel P. |
|
April 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - DV/TRO HEARING RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE REQUEST Judge: Maguire, Daniel P. |
|
April 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request to Continue Hearing - DV REISSUE TRO Notes: REISSUE TRO - ORDER ON REQ TO CONT HRG |
|
April 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Continued by Court's Motion CONT BY COURT'S MTN |
|
April 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney SUBST OF ATTORNEY Notes: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY KEITH BANKS IN PLACE OF PRO PER FOR RESPONDENT |
|
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
575 HRG RE: DV TRO Request for Order - DV/TRO HEARING RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE REQUEST Judge: Maguire, Daniel P. |
|
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request to Continue Hearing - DV REISSUE TRO Notes: REISSUE TRO - ORDER ON REQ TO CONT HRG |
|
January 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Income & Expense Declaration INC & EXP DECL Notes: BY PET |
|
January 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing NTC OF HEARING Notes: NOTICE OF HEARING |
|
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO JUDGE Notes: DOCUMENT SENT TO JUDGE MAGUIRE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.