Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Duplantis, Jessica, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Barbosa, Juan Daniel, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Cortes, Sonia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCortes, Sonia Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2020 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 16, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service SERVED JUAN DANIEL BARBOSA BY MAIL WITH REQUEST FOR ORDER ON 5/31/2022 FILED BY PET |
|
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order - Initial CUSTODY, VISITATION AND REQUEST FOR DISMISS RELATED CASE OR ONSOLIDATE FILED BY PET |
|
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney PRO PER IN PLACE OF BOBBY LUNA, ESQ. FOR PETN |
|
August 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure PETITIONERS PRELIMINARY |
|
August 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure DECL RE: SERV OF DEC Notes: PETITIONER'S PRELIMINARY |
|
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: RESPONDENT W/ FL PETITION, SUMM, BLANK RESPONSE, DCL UNDER UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT, LETTER TO MR. BARBOSA, STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR CUSTODY/VISITATION AND BLANK PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL; ON 02/13/2020 |
|
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Petition PETN FOR DISSO Notes: DISSO; MARRIAGE W/ KIDS |
|
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE Notes: FAP; JUDGE CORTES |
|
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued / Filed SUMMONS FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.