Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Azevedo, Serena L, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Azevedo, Nicholas Anthony, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Maguire, Daniel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaguire, Daniel Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2019 |
CategoryDissolution Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time186 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO JUDGE Notes: PROPOSED JUDGMENT SENT TO JUDGE FOR SIGNATURE |
|
June 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
FYI - RELATED CASE ON CALENDAR
Judge: Maguire, Daniel P. |
|
April 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
FYI - RELATED CASE ON CALENDAR
Judge: Maguire, Daniel P. |
|
March 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
FAMILY LAW FYI - RELATED CASE ON CALENDAR F320-285 Judge: Judge, Assigned |
|
December 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Petition PETN FOR DISSO Notes: JOINT PETITION FOR SUMMARY DISSOLUTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.