Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Porter, Casey M, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Maguire, Daniel P. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaguire, Daniel P. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 13, 2019 |
CategoryDv Prevention With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 21, 2020 | Docket Event | COPIES OF DOCUMENTS Notes: COPIES OF DOCUMENTS TO: SACRAMENTO COUNTY DCSS | |
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Stipulation STIP AND ORDER Notes: FAMILY LAW STIPULATION AND ORDER |
|
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
575 HRG RE: DV TRO Request for Order - DV/TRO HEARING RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE REQUEST Judge: Maguire, Daniel P. |
|
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Amended Restraining Order AMD RESTRAINING ORD Notes: AMENDED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER |
|
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request to Continue Hearing - DV REISSUE TRO Notes: REISSUE TRO - ORDER ON REQ TO CONT HRG |
|
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Continued by Party's Motion CONT BY PARTY'S MTN Notes: PETNR |
|
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
575 HRG RE: DV TRO Request for Order - DV/TRO HEARING RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE REQUEST Judge: Maguire, Daniel P. |
|
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: RACHEL A PORTER WITH TRO, NTC OF HRG, REQUEST FOR DVRO ON 12/24/19 |
|
December 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
*Interpreter Required During Hearing INTERPRETER REQUIRED Notes: ASL |
|
December 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing NTC OF HEARING Notes: NOTICE OF HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.