Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
County Of Solano, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Foldhazi, Andrew, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Umanzio, Dennis presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 15, 2019 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedJuly 16, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time463 days |
*Request for Order: Modification
Date: September 29, 2020*Request for Order: Modification
Date: October 20, 2020*Request for Order: Modification
Date: August 11, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order: Modification Cnt from 9-29-20-Pending Signed and filed Stipulation Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Stipulation & Order | |
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To COMM. UMANZIO - STIP AND ORD |
|
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing ON 9/29/20 |
|
October 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To COMM. UMANZIO - SHORT FORM ORDER AFTER HEARING ON 9/29/20 |
|
September 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order: Modification
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
September 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Continued by Party's Motion | |
August 17, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER AFTER HEARING ON 8/11/2020 | |
August 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
577 OSC/MOT MOD CHLD SPT *Request for Order: Modification MOD OF CHILD SUPPORT; 1/2 UHC AND WRCC; STEP DOWN LANGUAGE FILED BY YOLO COUNTY DCSS Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
August 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Continued by Party's Motion CONT BY PARTY'S MTN Notes: BY AGREEMENT OF ALL PARTIES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.