Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Gotfried, Michelle Lorraine, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Clark, Brandon Allan, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Cortes, Sonia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCortes, Sonia Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2018 |
CategoryOther Family Law |
Time To Trial627 days |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
|
*Trial Setting Conference
Date: June 04, 2021*Trial Setting Conference
Date: July 09, 2021*Trial Readiness Conference
Date: November 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Further Court Trial
Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Short Cause 2 days - term parental rights Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
November 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service ELECTRONICALLY SERVED KEITH BANKS WITH PETITIONER'S AMENDED TRIAL BRIEF ON 11/24/2021 |
|
November 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Amended PETITIONER'S AMENDED TRIAL BRIEF |
|
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DEPT 4 |
|
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Received EXHIBITS BY PETITIONER |
|
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Brief Filed TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY RESP |
|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Trial Readiness Conference Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt SIGNED 9/21/2021 |
|
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Trial Setting Conference Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.