Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
County Of Yolo, filed a(n) Dept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 28, 2017 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Responsive Declaration TO REQUEST ORDER FOR HEARING ON 8/23/22 |
|
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order - Modification CHILD SUPPORT |
|
October 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Judgment SUPPLEMENTAL JDGM Notes: AMENDED SUPP JDMT |
|
July 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FILE |
|
July 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: DONAT GAMINO WITH SUMMS, COMPLAINT, PROP JDMT, R&R, BLANK I&E, BLANK ANS, HANDBOOK, HEALTH INSUR INFO, VISIT VERIF ON 7/21/17 |
|
June 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued / Filed SUMMONS FILED |
|
June 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed - DO NOT USE FOR CLERK EDITION ONLY FAMILY SUPPORT COMPL Notes: FILED BY YO CO DCSS FSD# 2-1414409 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.