Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
County Of Yolo, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Umanzio, Dennis presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 28, 2017 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 17, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions71 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time75 days |
*Request for Order: Modification
Date: September 22, 2020*Request for Order: Modification
Date: November 03, 2020*Request for Order: Modification
Date: June 29, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Request for Order: Modification Judge: Taylor, Katherine |
|
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To COMM. TAYLOR FOR REVIEW OF STIP AND ORDER |
|
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Issue: Child Support | |
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order - Modification MODIFICATION CHILD SUPPORT, 1/2 UHC AND WRCC; STEP DOWN LANGUAGE FILED BY YOLO COUNTY DCSS |
|
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION SCHEDULED FOR 6/29/2021 AT 9:00 AM FILED BY YOLO COUNTY DCSS | |
November 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing ON 11/3/2020 |
|
November 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To COMM. UMANZIO - ORDER AFTER HEARING ON 11/3/20 |
|
November 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order: Modification Cont from 9-22-2020 Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Income & Expense Declaration FILED BY EDWARD KEOMANV |
|
September 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing SHORT FORM ORDER AFTER HEARING ON 9/22/20 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.