Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sindlinger, Barry Allen, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Daniels, Marlee Raye, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Warriner, Thomas E presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 27, 2017 |
CategoryDv Prevention With Minor Children |
Time To Trial99 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time346 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court
Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
June 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
575 HRG RE: DV TRO Request for Order - DV/TRO HEARING RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE REQUEST Judge: Maguire, Daniel P. |
|
June 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court
Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
June 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL *Trial: Court COURT TRIAL- 2 days Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
May 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Reassignment REASSIGNED JUDGE* Notes: CASE REASSIGNED TO JUDGE DANIEL P MAGUIRE |
|
May 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
FAMILY LAW *Trial Readiness Conference TRIAL READINESS CONF Judge: Maguire, Daniel P. |
|
January 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Reassignment REASSIGNED JUDGE* Notes: CASE REASSIGNED TO ASSIGNED JUDGE D4 |
|
January 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order ORD SET FAM CT TRIAL Notes: ORDER SETTING FAMILY COURT TRIAL |
|
January 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
FAMILY LAW *Trial Setting Conference TRIAL SETTING CONF Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
January 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FILE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.