Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rose, Emily Ann, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Young, Seth Dylan, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Gaard, Janet N presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 23, 2017 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time375 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF W/DRAWL ATTY Notes: KAREN EHLER FOR PET |
|
July 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF W/DRAWL ATTY Notes: NATHAN O. S. JONES, ESQ., FOR RESP |
|
July 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment NTC ENTRY JDGM - FL Notes: 7/3/2018 |
|
June 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure DECL RE: SERV OF DEC Notes: PET'S AMENDED PRELIM |
|
May 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Returned Documents RETURNED DOCUMENTS Notes: RETURNED DOCUMENTS: JUDGMENT |
|
May 22, 2018 | Docket Event | STIPULATION* Notes: AND WAIVER OF FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE | |
May 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Decl for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal Sep DECL DEFLT/UNCONT JG Notes: DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT |
|
May 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Personal Appearance APPEAR/STIP/WAIVER |
|
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FILE |
|
March 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Income & Expense Declaration INC & EXP DECL Notes: FOR SETH YOUNG |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.