Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Daniels, Joyce Evonne, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Daniels, Harvey Wes, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with White, Kathleen M presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 25, 2017 |
CategoryDissolution Without Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions172 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time176 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2018 | Docket Event | AMENDED* Notes: JUDGMENT FOR DISSO: MARITAL STATUS ENDS: 8/10/2018 | |
September 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment NTC ENTRY JDGM - FL Notes: ON AMENDED JUDGMENT OF DISSO |
|
March 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment NTC ENTRY JDGM - FL |
|
March 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Decl for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal Sep DECL DEFLT/UNCONT JG Notes: DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT |
|
March 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure DECL RE: SERV OF DEC Notes: BY PET; PRELIM |
|
March 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
*Request to Enter Default REQ TO ENTER DEFAULT Notes: REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT |
|
March 16, 2018 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ENTERED Notes: AS OF 3/12/2018 | |
February 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FILE |
|
February 09, 2018 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE Notes: PROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING: POSTED PETITION AND SUMMONS ON 1-10-18 THROUGH 2-9-18 AT YOLO SUPERIOR COURT | |
January 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
FAMILY LAW *Request for Order: Initial PET: REQ FOR PUB Judge: White, Kathleen M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.