Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Yolo, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Dennis A. Umanzio presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2017 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions41 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time45 days |
*Motion
Date: February 13, 2018*Order to Show Cause
Date: September 25, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Findings & Order After Hearing FIND & ORD AFT HRG Notes: FINDINGS & ORDER AFTER HEARING OF: 09/25/18 |
|
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
718 OSC* *Order to Show Cause Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
August 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: MARIA ELENA PALMER WITH ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND AFFIDAVIT FOR CONTEMPT ON 08/13/18 |
|
August 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause OSC* Notes: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE |
|
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
101 MOTION* *Motion NOTICE OF MOTION JUDICIAL DETERM OF ARREARS FILED BY YO CO DCSS Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation STIP AND ORDER Notes: STIPULATION AND ORDER |
|
December 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
*Motion NTC OF MOTION* Notes: NOTICE OF MOTION JUDICIAL DETERM OF ARREARS FILED BY YO CO DCSS |
|
December 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FILE |
|
November 02, 2017 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ENTERED Notes: AGAINST MARIA ELENA PALMER | |
November 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
*Request to Enter Default REQ TO ENTER DEFAULT Notes: REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST MARIA ELENA PALMER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.