Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Perez, Maribel, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Resendiz-Arvizu, Javier, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Maguire, Daniel P. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2017 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions70 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time206 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Findings & Order After Hearing FIND & ORD AFT HRG Notes: FINDINGS & ORDER AFTER HEARING OF: 9/30/19 |
|
December 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO JUDGE Notes: FOAH SENT TO JUDGE MAGUIRE |
|
September 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof / Affidavit of Publication POS BY POST & MAIL Notes: PROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING ON 8/21/19 TO 9/26/19 |
|
September 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
719 REQ FOR ORDER-FAMILY *Request for Order: Initial RE: MOD SUP VISITS Judge: Maguire, Daniel P. |
|
August 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order for Publication ORD FOR POSTING/PUB Notes: ORDER FOR POSTING |
|
August 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO JUDGE Notes: DOCUMENT SENT TO JUDGE MAGUIRE FOR REVIEW ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING |
|
August 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
FAMILY LAW *Request for Order: Initial RE: MOD CSTDY & VISIT Judge: Maguire, Daniel P. |
|
August 05, 2019 | Docket Event | APPLICATION* Notes: APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR POSTING FILED BY PET | |
August 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Continued by Party's Motion CONT BY PARTY'S MTN Notes: AT REQ OF PET |
|
June 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Continued by Party's Motion CONT BY PARTY'S MTN Notes: AT REQ OF PET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.