Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Donovan, Misty filed a(n) General Family - Family case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Daniel P. Maguire presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2016 |
CategoryOther Family Law |
Last RefreshedJuly 15, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time1752 days |
*Request for Order: Modification
Date: October 01, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order: Initial Custody, visitation, transfer venue Judge: Maguire, Daniel P. |
|
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Order for Publication or Posting | |
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To JUDGE MAGUIRE: ORDER FOR POSTING |
|
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Application for Order for Publication or Posting | |
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF ANGELA SMITH FROM THE YOLO COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE CHILD ABDUCTION UNIT | |
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Returned Documents APP AND ORDER FOR POSTING; SUBMIT ORDER DETACHED FROM APPLICATION; SUBMIT ATTACHMENTS WITH THE APPLICATION AND NOT AS A SEPARATE APPLICATION |
|
October 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order: Modification CHANGE CHILD CUSTODY/VISITATION/TRANSFER VENUE TO LOS ANGELES FILED MISTY DOVAN Judge: Maguire, Daniel P. |
|
August 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Responsive Declaration FILED BY MISTY DOVAN |
|
August 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order - Modification CHANGE CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATION; TRANSFER VENUE TO LOS ANGELES FILED BY MISTY DOVAN |
|
January 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Custody Order-Juvenile-Final Judgment JUV CUSTODY CASE Notes: JUVENILE CUSTODY CASE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.