Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Manica, Ronald, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2016 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time1560 days |
*Request for Order: Modification
Date: May 21, 2019*Request for Order: Modification
Date: May 26, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing ORD AFT HEARING Notes: SHORT FORM ORDER AFTER HEARING ON 5/26/20 |
|
May 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO JUDGE Notes: DOCUMENT SENT TO JUDGE UMANZIO |
|
May 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
577 OSC/MOT MOD CHLD SPT *Request for Order: Modification MOD OF CHILD SUPPORT FILED BY YOLO COUNTY DCSS Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
April 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAILING* Notes: SERVED SHERRI ANNETTE FOSTER WITH THE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE ON 3-25-2020 |
|
April 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAILING* Notes: SERVED RONALD BERNARD MANICA JR WITH THE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE ON 3-25-2020 |
|
March 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order: Modification MOD OF CHILD SUPPORT FILED BY YOLO COUNTY DCSS Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
March 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Continued by Court's Motion CONT BY COURT'S MTN Notes: BY COURT |
|
March 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF CONTINUANCE |
|
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event | ISSUE: CHILD SUPPORT | |
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order - Modification MOTION/OSC MOD Notes: MOTION/OSC FOR MOD OF CHILD SUPPORT FILED BY YOLO COUNTY DCSS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.