Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ali, Nicole, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Austin, Marc Isaac, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Janet Gaard presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2016 |
CategoryDv Prevention With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time118 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
FAMILY LAW Request for Order - DV/TRO HEARING RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE REQUEST Judge: Gaard, Janet N |
|
March 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request to Continue Hearing - DV REISSUE OSC Notes: REISSUE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE |
|
March 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
575 HRG RE: DV TRO Request for Order - DV/TRO HEARING RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE REQUEST Judge: Gaard, Janet N |
|
March 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL* |
|
February 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request to Continue Hearing - DV REISSUE OSC Notes: REISSUE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE |
|
February 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
FAMILY LAW Request for Order - DV/TRO HEARING RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE REQUEST Judge: Gaard, Janet N |
|
January 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE* Notes: JUDGE GAARD |
|
January 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing NTC OF HEARING Notes: NOTICE OF HEARING ON 2/11/16 |
|
January 22, 2016 | Docket Event | RELATED CASE FILES Notes: UFC - RELATED CASE FILES FL04-922 | |
January 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order (CLETS-TRO) OSC & TRO (CLETS) Notes: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.