Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Yolo, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Dennis A. Umanzio presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 28, 2015 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions79 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time84 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
FSD MINUTE ORDER *Request for Order: Modification Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
July 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Stipulation STIP AND ORDER Notes: STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY YOLO COUNTY DCSS |
|
June 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
*Motion NTC OF MOTION* Notes: NOTICE OF MOTION, MODIFICATION, CHILD SUPPORT, HEALTH CARE, STEP DOWN LANGUAGE, UNINSURED MEDICAL REIMBURSEMENT FILED BY YOLO COUNTY DCSS |
|
June 14, 2016 | Docket Event | ISSUE: CHILD SUPPORT | |
March 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Decl for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal Sep DECL DEFLT/UNCONT JG Notes: DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT |
|
March 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
*Request to Enter Default REQ TO ENTER DEFAULT Notes: REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ERICK ZARATE GUTIERREZ |
|
March 16, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ENTERED Notes: AGAINST ERICK ZARATE GUTIERREZ | |
February 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: ERICK ZARATE GUTIERREZ WITH SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, PROPOSED JUDGMENT, RIGHTS & RESPONSIBILITIES, SUPPORT HANDBOOK, BLANK I&E, BLANK ANSWER, HEALTH INS. INFO ON 1/30/16 |
|
December 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued / Filed SUMMONS FILED |
|
December 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
*Paternity Filing PATERNITY FILING Notes: PATERNITY FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.