Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hernandez, Enrique, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Zamarron, Victoria, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Kathleen M. White presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2015 |
CategoryOther Family Law |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time41 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
FAMILY LAW *Ex Parte Judge: White, Kathleen M |
|
October 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE* Notes: REASSIGN TO JUDGE GAARD |
|
July 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF W/DRAWL ATTY Notes: FILED BY PET |
|
July 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: MAIN SHELF |
|
June 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Stipulation STIP AND ORDER Notes: STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR CUSTODY AND/OR VISIATION OF CHILDREN |
|
June 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
110 REVIEW *Review STIPULATION Judge: White, Kathleen M |
|
June 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
719 REQ FOR ORDER-FAMILY *Request for Order: Initial RETURN ON CCRC FOR MOVE AWAY Judge: White, Kathleen M |
|
June 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FLF |
|
June 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL IN SUPPORT* Notes: PETITIONERS DECL IN SUPPORT OF ADOPTION OF CCRC RECOMMENDATIONS |
|
June 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC UNAVAIL COUNSEL Notes: UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL YASMIN COGSWELL SPIEGEL 6/9/16, 7/11-7/15/16, 7/25-7/29/16, 9/8/16, 10/13/16, 10/19-11/1/16, 11/10-11/14/16, 11/23-11/28/16, 12/8/16, 12/19/16-1/2/17 FOR PET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.