Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Yolo, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Dennis A. Umanzio presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2015 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time29 days |
*Request for Order: Modification
Date: October 29, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
577 OSC/MOT MOD CHLD SPT *Request for Order: Modification CTY'S MTN FILED 8-19-2019 Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
October 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Stipulation STIP AND ORDER Notes: STIPULATION AND ORDER |
|
September 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
FSD MINUTE ORDER *Request for Order: Modification AMILY SUPPORT HEALTH CARE STEP DOWN LANGUAGE UNINSURED MEDICAL REIMBURSEMENT AND CHILD CARE Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
September 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing ORD AFT HEARING Notes: SHORT FORM ORDER AFTER HEARING ON 9/17/2019 |
|
September 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Continued by Party's Motion CONT BY PARTY'S MTN Notes: AT DCSS REQUEST |
|
September 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Income & Expense Declaration INC & EXP DECL Notes: FILED BY OTHER PARENT ADRIANA MASDEO |
|
September 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Response - No Fee RESPONSE* Notes: RESPONSE TO GOVERNMENTAL NOTICE OF MOTION OR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED BY OTHER PARENT |
|
August 19, 2019 | Docket Event | ISSUE: CHILD SUPPORT | |
August 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order - Initial MOTION/OSC INITIAL Notes: MOTION/OSC INITIAL FOR FAMILY SUPPORT HEALTH CARE STEP DOWN LANGUAGE UNINSURED MEDICAL REIMBURSEMENT AND CHILD CARE FILED BY DCSS |
|
September 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: JACOB ARTHUR MASDEO WITH 1ST SUPPLEMENTAL SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, PROPOSED JUDGMENT, RIGHTS & RESPONSIBILITIES, BLANK ANS, BLANK I&E, VISITATION VERIFICATION, HEALTH INSURANCE INFORMATION AND CHILD SUPPORT HANDBOOK ON 09/18/18 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.