Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Sacramento, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Dennis A. Umanzio presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2015 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time1579 days |
*Motion
Date: September 10, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice - Registration of Foreign Support Order NTC OF REGISTRATION Notes: NOTICE OF REGISTRATION- OUT OF COUNTY SUPPORT ORD: SACRAMENTO COUNTY |
|
November 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF RESPONSIBILTY Notes: CHG RESPONSIBILITY MANAGING SUPPORT-COUNTY; SACRAMENTO |
|
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing ORD AFT HEARING Notes: ORDER AFTER HEARING OF 9/10/19 |
|
September 12, 2019 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT LIST SCANNED Notes: EXHIBIT LIST VERIFIED | |
September 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO JUDGE Notes: DOCUMENT SENT TO JUDGE ORDER AFTER HEARING |
|
September 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
723 MTN FOR SUPPORT *Motion FAMILY SUPPORT; STEP DOWN LANGUAGE; UNINSURED MEDICAL REIMBURSEMENT; CHILD CARE Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
September 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List COURTS EXHIBIT LIST Notes: COURTS EXHIBIT LIST |
|
September 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
*Motion FAMILY SUPPORT; STEP DOWN LANGUAGE; UNINSURED MEDICAL REIMBURSEMENT; CHILD CARE Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
August 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF CONTINUANCE |
|
August 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Continued by Court's Motion CONT BY COURT'S MTN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.