Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Butte, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Umanzio, Dennis presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 31, 2015 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time1287 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE* Notes: OF REGISTRATION OF CA SUPPORT ORDER | |
December 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing ORD AFT HEARING Notes: FROM 12/8/15 |
|
December 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
FSD MINUTE ORDER *Request for Order: Modification DEFT NOT PRESENT O/P NOT PRESENT DCSS ATTY P WARD FATHER TO PAY C/S OF $46/MO FOR TIARA, BEG 12/01/15. FATHER'S OBLIGATION TO PAY C/S FOR JESSE IS TERMINATED, BEG 12/01/15. LOW-INCOME ADJ APPLIES. BOTH PARENTS TO PROVIDE HEALTH INS AS PREVIOUSLY ORDERED. EACH PARENT TO PAY 1/2 UHCC & 1/2 WRCC. S/D LANG ORDERED. Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
November 06, 2015 | Docket Event | ISSUE: CHILD SUPPORT | |
November 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
*Motion NTC OF MOTION* Notes: NOTICE OF MOTION, MODIFICATION, CHILD SUPPORT, ADD-ONS FILED BY YOLO COUNTY DCSS |
|
August 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Regarding Payment of Support (Governmental) NTC OF PYMT OF SPPT Notes: YOLO COUNTY IS NOW ENTERING THIS CASE FOR ALL SUPPORT PURPOSES. FSD# 0070018995-01 |
|
July 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF REG. SENT Notes: NOTICE OF REGISTRATION SENT TO SUPERIOR COURT OF BUTTE COUNTY AND THEIR LOCAL DCSS AGENCY |
|
July 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice - Registration of Foreign Support Order REG CALIF. SUPPORT Notes: YOLO COUNTY IS NOW ENFORCING COUNTY OF BUTTE'S CHILD SUPPORT ORDER. YOLO COUNTY NOW HAS JURISDICTION OVER CHILD SUPPORT. FSD# 0070018995-01 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.