Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Parks, Kelly Leigh, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Mascarenas Michelli, John Anthony, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Kathleen M. White presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 28, 2015 |
CategoryDv Prevention Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time56 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Vacated DROPPED FROM CAL |
|
September 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
575 HRG RE: DV TRO Request for Order - DV/TRO HEARING RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE REQUEST Judge: White, Kathleen M |
|
July 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
575 HRG RE: DV TRO Request for Order - DV/TRO HEARING RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE REQUEST Judge: White, Kathleen M |
|
July 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request to Continue Hearing - DV REISSUE DV TRO Notes: REISSUE DV TRO - ORDER ON REQ TO CONT HRG |
|
April 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing NTC OF HEARING Notes: NOTICE OF HEARING ON 7/18/16 |
|
April 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request to Continue Hearing - DV REISSUE OSC Notes: REISSUE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE |
|
October 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAILING* Notes: SERVED JOHN MICHELLI W/ ORDER OF PROTECTION ON 9/28/15 |
|
September 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
FAMILY LAW Request for Order - DV/TRO HEARING RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE REQUEST- PETITIONER PRESENT S&T COURT HAS NOTICE. COURT FINDS GOOD CAUSE TO GRANT AS PRAYED TO RUN CONCURRENT W/ RELATED CASE F315-934 RESTRAINING ORDER EXPIRES 7/28/16 AT 5PM Judge: White, Kathleen M |
|
September 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLKS CERT OF MAIL |
|
September 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
FAMILY LAW Request for Order - DV/TRO HEARING RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE REQUEST- PETITIONER PRESENT COURT CONTINUES ON ITS OWN MOTION CNT TO 9/22/15 AT 10AM IN D3 FOR DVRO CLERK TO SERVE COURT TAKES JUDICIAL NOTICE OF RELATED CASE F315-934 Judge: White, Kathleen M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.