Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Yolo, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Umanzio, Dennis presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMarch 20, 2014 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions116 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time116 days |
*Order to Show Cause
Date: November 28, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
FYI - RELATED CASE ON CALENDAR FS14-426
Judge: White, Kathleen M |
|
December 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing ORD AFT HEARING Notes: SHORT FORM ORDER AFTER HEARING FILED BY YOLO COUNTY DCSS FSD#2-1339969 |
|
December 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Warrant of Body Attachment Issued WARR BDY ATTACH ISS Notes: WARRANT OF BODY ATTACHMENT ISSUED |
|
November 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
718 OSC* *Order to Show Cause SEEK WORK Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
November 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
FSD MINUTE ORDER *Order of Examination: Non-Appealed Case ORDER OF EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
November 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: THOMAS RANDOLPH WEIRICK WITH APP AND ORDER FOR APP AND EXAM FILED 10/17/16 & OSC FILED 10/17/16 ON 10/27/16 FILED BY YOLO COUNTY DCSS FSD#2-1339969 |
|
October 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause OSC* Notes: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO SEEK WORK FILED BY YOLO COUNTY DCSS FSD#2-1339969 |
|
October 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Application for Order for Judgment Debtor Exam APP/ORD DEBTOR EXAM Notes: FILED BY YOLO COUNTY DCSS FSD#2-1339969 |
|
May 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
*Motion DCSS A GLANZER DEF N/P O/P SARAH PARSON S&T CT RECEIVES COUNTY'S 1: DECLARATION OF PATERNITY FATHER'S MOTION IS DENIED Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
May 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing ORD AFT HEARING Notes: ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT OF PATERNITY DENIED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.