Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Akulova, Anna V, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Vlasenko, Arthur V, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Maguire, Daniel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaguire, Daniel Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 21, 2013 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time230 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney SUBST OF ATTORNEY Notes: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: PRO PER PETITIONER IN PLACE OF ERIC RIVIERA-JURADO, ESQ |
|
May 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO JUDGE Notes: DOCUMENT SENT TO JUDGE MAGUIRE FOR REVIEW OF FAO |
|
May 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Findings & Order After Hearing FIND & ORD AFT HRG Notes: FINDINGS & ORDER AFTER HEARING OF: 5/8/20 |
|
May 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
110 REVIEW *Review CUSTODY Judge: Maguire, Daniel P. |
|
April 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL* Notes: DECLARATION OF ERIC RIVIERA-JURALDO, ESQ. REGARDING PHONE CONVERSATION WITH VISITATION SUPERVISOR |
|
March 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
FAMILY LAW *Review CUSTODY Judge: Judge, Assigned |
|
March 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF CONTINUANCE |
|
March 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Continued by Court's Motion CONT BY COURT'S MTN |
|
March 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL* Notes: DECLARATION OF ANGELA SMITH FROM THE YOLO COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY OFFICE CHILD ABDUCTION UNIT |
|
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
110 REVIEW *Review CUSTODY Judge: Maguire, Daniel P. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.