Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Dahlberg, Elise A, Flores, Francisco, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Umanzio, Dennis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeUmanzio, Dennis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 19, 2013 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time1772 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF W/DRAWL ATTY Notes: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD |
|
March 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
FSD MINUTE ORDER *Request for Order: Initial Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
March 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Minute Comment DROPPED FR CALENDAR Notes: AT REQUEST OF: ALL PARTIES |
|
February 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration RESPONSIVE DECL* Notes: TO REQUEST FOR ORDER BY DCSS |
|
February 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FILE |
|
February 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Response - No Fee RESPONSE* Notes: RESPONSE TO GOVERNMENTAL NOT OF MOTION OR ORD TO SHOW CAUSE; FILED BY ELISA A. DAHLBERG |
|
February 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAILING* Notes: SERVED ELISE DALBERG WITH NOT OF HRG, I&E ON 2/2/18 |
|
February 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAILING* Notes: SERVED YOLO CO DCSS WITH NOT OF HRG, I&E ON 2/2/18 |
|
January 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: SHELF |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Income & Expense Declaration INC & EXP DECL Notes: BY RESP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.