Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Kelsch, Christopher C., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Kelsch, Laura M., in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Richardson, Paul presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichardson, Paul Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 19, 2013 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedMay 20, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
*Request for Order: Modification
Date: August 11, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Request for Order: Modification MODIFY SPOUSAL OR PARTNER SUPPORT; FILED BY RESPONDENT LAURA M PETITT Judge: Richardson, Paul K. |
|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event | *Dismissal: Lack of Prosecution | |
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration FILED BY LAURA PETITT |
|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Income & Expense Declaration FILED BY RESPONDENT LAURA M PETITT |
|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order - Modification MODIFY SPOUSAL OR PARTNER SUPPORT; FILED BY RESPONDENT LAURA M PETITT |
|
August 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment NTC ENTRY JDGM - FL |
|
July 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Decl for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal Sep DECL DEFLT/UNCONT JG Notes: DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT |
|
July 27, 2015 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ENTERED Notes: AS OF 7/15/15 | |
July 27, 2015 | Docket Event | STIPULATION* Notes: AND WAIVER OF FINAL DCL OF DISCL | |
July 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure DECL SERVE FINAL DEC Notes: BY RESP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.