Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Yolo, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Umanzio, Dennis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeUmanzio, Dennis Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 18, 2013 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions69 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time70 days |
*Request for Order: Initial
Date: December 01, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
FSD MINUTE ORDER *Request for Order: Initial UNREIMB MED & CHILD CARE BY: OTHER PARENT REBECCA FERREIRA Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
October 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing ORD AFT HEARING |
|
October 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order: Initial UNREIMB MED & CHILD CARE, BY REBECCA E FERREIRA Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
September 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF CONTINUANCE |
|
September 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Continued by Court's Motion CONT BY COURT'S MTN |
|
September 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration RESPONSIVE DECL* Notes: RESPONSIVE DECLARATION TO REQUEST FOR ORDER |
|
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order - Initial REQUEST ORDER FAMILY Notes: REQUEST FOR ORDER: UNREIMB MED & CHILD CARE, BY REBECCA E FERREIRA |
|
April 17, 2018 | Docket Event | COPIES OF DOCUMENTS Notes: COPIES OF DOCUMENTS TO: DCSS | |
February 02, 2018 | Docket Event | COPIES OF DOCUMENTS Notes: COPIES OF DOCUMENTS TO: YOLO CO DCSS | |
December 27, 2017 | Docket Event | COPIES OF DOCUMENTS Notes: COPIES OF DOCUMENTS TO: YOLO CO DCSS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.