Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Sacramen, To, Et Al, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Umanzio, Dennis presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 25, 2010 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order: Modification DCSS PATRICK WARD COUNTY ASKS THAT MATTER BE DROPPED REMOVED FROM CALENDAR Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
September 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order: Modification DCSS PATRICK WARD DEFENDANT APPEARED LATE O/P FRANCES CLAIBORNE APPEARED LATE CONTINUED AT PARTIES REQUEST TO 10/26/10 1:30 PM Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
September 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
Continued by Party's Motion CONT BY PARTY'S MTN |
|
August 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
*Motion NTC OF MOTION* Notes: NOTICE OF MOTION RE MODIFICATION OF CHILD SUPPORT (FILED BY DCSS ATTY, PATRICK WARD) |
|
August 13, 2010 | Docket Event | ISSUE: CHILD SUPPORT Notes: CHILD SUPPORT | |
August 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FILE-AWAY |
|
March 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice Regarding Payment of Support (Governmental) NTC OF PYMT OF SPPT Notes: YOLO COUNTY DCSS IS ENTERING THIS CASE FOR ALL SUPPORT PURPOSES; FSD# 0670701712-01 (FILED BY DCSS CLK, DEBBIE A BOSSE) |
|
March 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAILING* Notes: MAILED: STATEMENT FOR REG OF CALIFORNIA SUPPORT ORDER, NTC RE PAYMENT OF SUPPORT - SUB OF PAYEE, TO: BILLY WAYNE CLAIBORNE, ON 03/02/2010 |
|
March 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAILING* Notes: MAILED: STATEMENT FOR REG OF CALIFORNIA SUPPORT ORDER, NTC RE PAYMENT OF SUPPORT - SUB OF PAYEE, TO: FRANCES MIRANDA CLAIBORNE, ON 03/02/2010 |
|
March 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FILE-AWAY (DOCS FILED 03/04/2010) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.