Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Yolo, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Umanzio, Dennis presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 22, 2010 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions100 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time103 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL* Notes: DCL AND REQ FOR DISPOSITION OF CIVIL EXHIBITS; ORD FOR DISPOSITION OF EXHIBITS, DEPOSITIONS OR ADMINISTRATIVE RECORDS IN CIVIL ACTION |
|
October 24, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE* Notes: NOTICE OF DESTRUCTION OF CIVIL EXHIBITS, DEPOSITIONS AND ADMINISTRATIVE RECORDS | |
April 19, 2019 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT LIST SCANNED Notes: EXHIBIT LIST VERIFIED | |
April 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
FSD MINUTE ORDER *Request for Order: Modification NOTICE OF MOTION MODIFICATION CHILD CUSTODY AND HEALTH CARE; STEP DOWN LANGUAGE/ UNINSURED MEDICAL REIMBURSEMENT; CHILD CARE Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
April 09, 2019 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT LIST Notes: COUNTY'S EXHIBIT LIST | |
April 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing ORD AFT HEARING |
|
March 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
*Motion NTC OF MOTION* Notes: NOTICE OF MOTION MODIFICATION CHILD CUSTODY AND HEALTH CARE; STEP DOWN LANGUAGE/ UNINSURED MEDICAL REIMBURSEMENT; CHILD CARE |
|
March 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Issue: Child Custody ISSUE: CHILD CUST. |
|
June 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Stipulation STIP AND ORDER Notes: STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY YOLO COUNTY DCSS |
|
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order: Modification DCSS A GLANZER DEFENDANT O/P S JUAREZ WRITTEN STIPULATION SUBMITTED; OFF CALENDAR Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.