Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Yolo, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Umanzio, Dennis presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2010 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time250 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
FSD MINUTE ORDER *Request for Order: Modification Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
April 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing ORD AFT HEARING Notes: FROM 4/5/16 |
|
March 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
*Motion NTC OF MOTION* Notes: NOTICE OF MOTION, MODIFICATION, CHILD SUPPORT, HEALTH CARE, STEP DOWN LANGUAGE, UNINSURED MEDICAL REIMBURSEMENT AND CHILD CARE FILED BY YOLO COUNTY DCSS |
|
March 08, 2016 | Docket Event | ISSUE: CHILD SUPPORT | |
December 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing ORD AFT HEARING Notes: 11/20/12 |
|
November 30, 2012 | Docket Event | RECEIVED* Notes: ord aft hrg | |
November 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: d12 |
|
November 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order: Modification NO APP DCSS GLANZER SUPPORT ORDER FOR CHAZ IS NOW TERMINATED. MOTHER TO PAY $57.00 PER MO FOR LILLIAN FOR THE PERIOD OF 11/ 2012 AND ONGOING. ALL OTHER ORDERS REMAIN IN EFFECT. DCSS TO PREPARE A FORMAL ORDER. Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
October 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
*Motion NTC OF MOTION* Notes: NOTICE OF MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF CHILD SUPPORT |
|
October 18, 2012 | Docket Event | ISSUE: CHILD SUPPORT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.