Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Wallis, Michelle, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Wallis, Bryan V, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Maguire, Daniel P. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 20, 2010 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 16, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions518 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
*Request for Order: Modification
Date: June 16, 2020*Request for Order: Enforcement
Date: December 08, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Family Support Minute Order *Trial Setting Conference RFO - arrears Judge: Assigned, Judge |
|
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing SHORT FORM ORDER AFTER HEARING ON 12/8/20 |
|
December 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To COMM. UMANZIO - SHORT FORM ORDER AFTER HEARING ON 12/8/20 |
|
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order: Enforcement DETERMINATION OF ARREARS FILED BY RESP Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Returned Documents REQUEST FOR ORDER ON ARREARS - YOLO COUNTY DCSS IS INVOLVED IN THIS CASE NOTICE MUST ALSO BE GIVEN TO THEM. |
|
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service SERVED LORA GREVIOUS WITH REQUEST FOR ORDER, DECLARATION OF PAYMENT HISTORY ON 11/6/20 BY ELECTRONIC SERVICE |
|
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service SERVED REQUEST FOR ORDER, DECLARATION OF PAYMENT HISTORY ON 11/6/20 BY ELECTRONIC SERVICE |
|
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order - Enforcement DETERMINATION OF ARREARS FILED BY RESP |
|
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration OF PAYMENT HISTORY FILED BY RESP |
|
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Lodging of Documents STIPULATION AND ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.