Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Newcomb, Dianna L, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Newcomb, Gerald, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Gaard, Janet presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 21, 2008 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
FAMILY LAW FYI - RELATED CASE ON CALENDAR F315-1205 Judge: Gaard, Janet N |
|
April 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause NO APPEARANCES; NO PROOF OF SERVICE DROPPED FROM CALENDAR Judge: Reed, David W. |
|
March 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FAMILY FILE AWAY |
|
March 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause OSC* Notes: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO TERMINATE MARRIAGE (Filed by Petn) |
|
July 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order STIP/ORD AFT MEDIATE Notes: STIPULATION REACHED IN MEADIATION AND SO ORDERED. |
|
July 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause BOTH PARTIES PRESENT IN PRO PER. AFTER MEDIATION WITH DARLENE WOODCOCK, STIPULATION REACHED AND SO ORDERED. Judge: Shockley, Doris L |
|
July 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
Declaration RESPONSIVE DECL* Notes: TO OSC OR NTC OF MTN (Filed by Petn) |
|
July 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAILING* Notes: OSC - RESPONSE TO GERALD NEWCOMB MAILED 7/1/08 |
|
July 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: DEPT 11 |
|
June 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAILING* Notes: DIANNA NEWCOMB SERVED W/ RESP/UCCJEA/PROPERTY DECL ON 6/26/08. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.