Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gantar, Victoria, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Gantar, James, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with McAdam, Samuel presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 21, 2008 |
CategoryOther Family Law |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time90 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FILE AWAY |
|
September 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC UNAVAIL COUNSEL Notes: UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL RAQUEL M. SILVA - OCT. 3-10, 18-22, NOV. 19-23, DEC. 21, 2012 - JAN. 4, 2013 |
|
May 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC UNAVAIL COUNSEL Notes: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL RAQUEL M. SILVA: JUNE 15, 2012, JULY 4-13, 2012 AND AUGUST 24-SEPT. 4, 2012 |
|
May 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FILE AWAY |
|
January 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause : DENTAL INSURANCE Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
December 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Income & Expense Declaration INC & EXP DECL Notes: BY PETITIONER VICTORIA GANTAR |
|
December 22, 2011 | Docket Event | CONSOLIDATED/CLOSED | |
December 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC UNAVAIL COUNSEL Notes: UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL - RAQUEL M SILVA, ATTY FOR PETN, VICTORIA GANTAR, WILL BE UNAVAILABLE DECEMBER 23, 2011 THROUGH AND INCLUDING JANUARY 6, 2012 |
|
December 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FILE-AWAY |
|
December 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney SUBST OF ATTORNEY Notes: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY - ATTY RAQUEL M SILVA FOR PETN VICTORIA GANTAR IN PLACE OF PARTY IN PRO PER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.