Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Tejeda, Kevin J., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Tejeda, Margaret L., in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Judge, Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudge, Assigned Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 27, 2007 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time2418 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause Post-Disposition
Judge: White, Kathleen M |
|
December 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment NTC ENTRY JDGM - FL |
|
December 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
Decl for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal Sep DECL DEFLT/UNCONT JG Notes: DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT |
|
December 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure DECL SERVE FINAL DEC Notes: Petitioner's Preliminary and Final Decl. re service of Decl. of Disclosure and Inc. & Exp. Decl. |
|
December 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure DECL SERVE FINAL DEC Notes: RESPONDENT'S PRELIMINARY/FINAL |
|
December 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Personal Appearance APPEAR/STIP/WAIVER |
|
December 03, 2013 | Docket Event | STIPULATION* Notes: stipulation and waiver of final decl. of disclosure | |
October 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned RETURNED MAIL |
|
October 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLKS CERT OF MAIL |
|
October 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause OSC* Notes: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE / ORDER TO APPEAR AT NEXT HEARING AND SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.