Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Guerrero, Michele, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Guerrero, David, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Judge, Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 27, 2007 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time226 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FAMILY FILE AWAY |
|
October 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF W/DRAWL ATTY Notes: ALEXANDRA P FULLERTON WITHDRAWS AS ATTY OF REC FOR PETN MICHELLE GUERRERO. LAST KNOWN ADDRESS FOR PETN IS 2792 SHINN COURT, WOODLAND, CA 95776, 530-666-7488 |
|
October 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAILING* Notes: JUDGMENT TO JASON BORG MAILED 10/19/07 |
|
October 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FILE |
|
October 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF W/DRAWL ATTY Notes: WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR RESPONDENT DAVID BLANCE GUERRERO/JASON BORG |
|
October 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FAMILY FILE AWAY |
|
October 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAILING* Notes: APPEARANCE, STIP AND WAIVER, AND STIP AND WAIVER OF FINAL DEC OF DISCL TO JASON BORG MAILED 10/3/07 |
|
October 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment NTC ENTRY JDGM - FL Notes: ENTERED ON 10/11/07 |
|
October 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Decl for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal Sep DECL DEFLT/UNCONT JG Notes: DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT |
|
October 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Personal Appearance APPEAR/STIP/WAIVER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.