Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Co Of Yolo, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Judge, Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2007 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions71 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time76 days |
*Motion
Date: October 30, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Stipulation STIP AND ORDER Notes: STIPULATION AND ORDER |
|
April 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO JUDGE Notes: DOCUMENT SENT TO JUDGE FOR REVIEW AND SIGNATURE ON STIPULATION AND ORDER |
|
October 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
101 MOTION* *Motion MODIFICATION OF CHILD SUPPORT, HEALTH CARE, STEP DOWN LANGUAGE AND ADD ON'S Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
October 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Vacated DROPPED FROM CAL Notes: STIPULATION SUBMITTED |
|
October 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation STIP AND ORDER Notes: STIPULATION AND ORDER |
|
September 24, 2018 | Docket Event | ISSUE: CHILD SUPPORT | |
September 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
*Motion NTC OF MOTION* Notes: NOTICE OF MOTION MODIFICATION OF CHILD SUPPORT, HEALTH CARE, STEP DOWN LANGUAGE AND ADD ON'S |
|
January 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL* Notes: NTC TO COURT OF COMPROMISE OF ARREARS BY YO CO DCSS |
|
July 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing ORD AFT HEARING Notes: FRM CT DATE OF 7-14-08 IN DP16 - DEF FTA, WBA ISSUED FOR $500 BAIL, DAYTIME SERVICE ONLY, EXPIRES 7-14-09 |
|
July 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
Warrant of Body Attachment Issued WARR BDY ATTACH ISS Notes: WARRANT OF BODY ATTACHMENT ISSUED $500 BAIL, DAYTIME SERVICE ONLY EXPIRES 7-14-09 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.