Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Turner, Toni, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Judge, Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 15, 2007 |
CategoryDv Prevention With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time49 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
FYI - RELATED CASE ON CALENDAR
Judge: White, Kathleen M |
|
May 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
FYI - RELATED CASE ON CALENDAR FL07-405
Judge: White, Kathleen M |
|
September 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FAMILY FILE AWAY |
|
September 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney SUBST OF ATTORNEY Notes: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY - ATTY JANET M STROMAN FOR PETN TONI TURNER IN PLACE OF ATTY SARAH B ORR |
|
April 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court COURT TRIAL PET PRES W/ATTY ORR; RESP PRES PRO PER; PETITIONER RE Q TO DROP RTO; RESP REQ TO GO FORTH; COUNSEL ADV COUR T THERE IS A CRIM PROTECTIVE ORDER IN RESPONDENT'S CR IMINAL CASE; COURT GRANTED DISMISSAL OF THIS ACTION Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
April 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause
Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
April 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: SUSAN BENDER |
|
April 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAILING* Notes: MAILED: ANSWER TO TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER TO SAR AH B ORR ON 4-2-07 |
|
March 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: DEPT11 BIN (4/4/07) |
|
March 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited ANSWER Notes: OF ALLEN TURNER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.