Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Perez, Celia S, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Perez, Arcadio R, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Judge, Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudge, Assigned Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2007 |
CategoryDv Prevention Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time103 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause PETITIONER PRESENT. COURT GRANTS RESTRAINING ORDER FOR 1 YEAR AT REQUEST OF PETITIONER. Judge: Shockley, Doris L |
|
April 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FAMILY FILE AWAY |
|
March 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
Civil Harassment TRO TEMP RESTRAINING ORD Notes: ORDERS AGAINST DEFT ARCADIO R PEREZ EXPIRE 4/7/08 AT 830AM. |
|
March 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: COUNTER FILE-AWAY |
|
March 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause BOTH PARTIES PRESENT; RESPONDENT IN CUSTODY RESPONDENT HAS PENDING CRIMINAL CASE; MATTER CONTINUE D BY THE COURT. TEMPORARY ORDERS REMAIN IN EFFECT. Judge: Shockley, Doris L |
|
February 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: ARCADIO R. PEREZ 2/5/08 DV-125, DV-130 |
|
February 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order on Request to Continue Hearing APP/ORD REISSUE* Notes: ORDERS AGAINST DEFT ARCADIO R PEREZ EXPIRE 3/12/08 AT 8:30AM. |
|
February 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause PETITIONER PRESENT; CRIMINAL CASE STILL PENDING. ALL TEMP ORDERS REMAIN IN EFFECT. Judge: Shockley, Doris L |
|
February 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: RED CARD ON MAIN SHELF |
|
January 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Civil Harassment TRO TEMP RESTRAINING ORD Notes: AGAINST DEFT ARCADIO R PEREZ ORDERS EXPIRE 2/4/08 AT 5PM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.