Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ayon, Francisco M., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Figueroa, Elvia Ayon, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Judge, Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management157 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions630 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time637 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment NTC ENTRY JDGM - FL |
|
September 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
Decl for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal Sep DECL DEFLT/UNCONT JG Notes: DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT |
|
September 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
*Request to Enter Default REQ TO ENTER DEFAULT Notes: REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AS TO RESP. ELVIA AYON FIGUEROA |
|
September 19, 2008 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ENTERED Notes: AS TO RESP. ELVIA AYON FIGUEROA | |
September 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL* Notes: PET.'S PRELIMINARY & FINAL DECLARATION RE: SERVICE OFDISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION |
|
September 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT TO ATTY UNIT FOR REVIEW |
|
September 15, 2008 | Docket Event |
*Status Conference PETITIONER WITH FLF AS SPANISH INTERPRETER. PETITIONER REFERRED TO FLF FOR ASSISTANCE IN COMPLETING DISSOLUTION. Judge: Shockley, Doris L |
|
March 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
*Status Conference NO APPEARANCES; COURT CONTINUES TO 9/15/08 8:30 D11. Judge: Shockley, Doris L |
|
March 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Continued by Court's Motion CONT BY COURT'S MTN |
|
September 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
Continued by Court's Motion CONT BY COURT'S MTN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.