Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Zafra, Kami J, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Rosenberg, David presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2005 |
CategoryDv Prevention With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time35 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 11, 2005 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: RANDY ZAFRA WITH ANSWER TO TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATION ORDER; TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; SUPERVISED VISITAITON ORDER, ORDER: NO TRAVEL WITH CHILDREN ON 02-22-05 |
|
March 11, 2005 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: SHELF |
|
March 04, 2005 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: RANDY ZAFRA WITH DV101; DV105; DV120; DV140; DV150'; DV110 |
|
March 04, 2005 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: SHELF |
|
March 01, 2005 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: shelf |
|
March 01, 2005 | Docket Event | MOTION GRANTED* Notes: MOTION GRANTED FOR RESTRAINING ORDER - AS MODIFIED - FOR THREE (3) YEARS. | |
March 01, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause DEFENDANT SUBMITTED ANSWER TO THE COURT. AGREES TO FULL CUSTODY TO MOTHER. ASKS TO BE ALLOWED TO WRITE/SEND CARDS AFTER HE COMPLETES ORDERS OF CPS. RESTRAINING ORDER GRANTED, AS MODIFIED, FOR 3 YEARS. Judge: Rosenberg, David |
|
February 18, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE PETITONEER APPEARS/ RESPONDENT IN CUSTODY AT YCSO TEMP REST ORD GRANTED//IN EFFECT UNTIL 3-1-05 CONTINUED TO/FOR: OCS 3-1-05 9:30 D-7 Judge: Rosenberg, David |
|
February 18, 2005 | Docket Event |
Request to Continue Hearing - DV REISSUE OSC Notes: REISSUE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RESTRAINED PERSON IS RANDY ZAFRA |
|
February 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause
Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.