Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Perez, Maria De Jesus, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Judge, Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudge, Assigned Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2005 |
CategoryDv Prevention With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time20 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: SHELF |
|
January 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: JAVIER PONCE WITH ATTACHMENTS, CHILD CUSTODY, VISITATION & SUPPORT REQUEST DV 100, ETC ON 1/4/06 |
|
January 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause CASE CONSOLIDATED W/F3 02-1421 Judge: Petre, Donna M |
|
January 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause
Judge: Petre, Donna M |
|
January 12, 2006 | Docket Event | RECEIVED* Notes: (rec'd mail copy of sheriff's proof of service showing defendant served on 1-4-06) | |
January 12, 2006 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: file away |
|
January 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited ANSWER Notes: OF JAVIER PONCE |
|
January 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: UCD FAMILY PROTECTION CLINIC 1/11/06 WITH COPY OF ANSWER |
|
December 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order APP/DECL OSC/TRO-DV |
|
December 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order (CLETS-TRO) OSC & TRO (CLETS) Notes: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDR RESTRAINED PERSON IS JAVIER PONCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.