Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Voroukoumanh, Mary, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Warriner, Thomas presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2005 |
CategoryDv Prevention With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time194 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause OSC-TRO NO APPEARANCE, CASE NOT PRESENT IN DEPT 11 Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
August 03, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause ORS/TRO REVIEW JUDGE TEW PER ATTY ROTH THIS CASE HAS BEEN CONTINUED COUNSEL REQUESTED CONTINUANCE BECAUSE 730 EVALUATION NOT PREPARED CONTINUED TO/FOR: 8/10/05 AT 8:30 A.M. FOR OSC D-11 Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
August 03, 2005 | Docket Event |
Continued by Party's Motion CONT BY PARTY'S MTN |
|
July 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause OSC/TRO REVIEW ATTY ROTH APPEARS ADV COURT BY AGREEMENT OF COUNSEL MATTER IS CONTINUED TO 8-3-05 8:30AM OSC DEPT 11; ALL CURRENT TEMP ORDERS REMAIN Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
June 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
FYI - RELATED CASE ON CALENDAR JD 05-191
Judge: Petre, Donna M |
|
May 24, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause PARTIES REACHED AN AGREEMENT PENDING FURTHER HEARING.TEMPORARY ORDERS REMAIN IN EFFECT. Judge: Petre, Donna M |
|
May 20, 2005 | Docket Event |
Filed CASE SUMMARY SHEET Notes: CASE SUMMARY SHEET FOR UNIFIED FAMILY COURT |
|
May 12, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause TEMPORARY ORDERS CONTINUED; MOTHER REFERRRED TO UFC THERAPIST. Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
May 05, 2005 | Docket Event |
Request to Continue Hearing - DV REISSUE OSC Notes: TRO CONTINUED IN COURT TO 5-12-05. |
|
February 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Review FATHER IS NOT HAPPY WITH CURRENT ARRANGEMENTS AND WHATS CUSTODY OF THE CHILDREN; TEMPORARY ORDERS TO REMAIN IN EFFECT PENDING NEXT HEARING CONTINUED TO/FOR:5/12/05 @ 1:30 D11 Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.