Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Yolo, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Ybarra, Esperanza G, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Judge, Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 22, 2005 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions433 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time440 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL* Notes: NOTICE TO COURT OF COMPROMISE OF ARREARS FILED BY YOLO COUNTY DCSS |
|
January 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
FYI - RELATED CASE ON CALENDAR RESPONDENT PRESENT; FATHER NOT PRESENT; NO ACTION TAKEN IN THIS CASE;
Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
October 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
FYI - RELATED CASE ON CALENDAR RESPONDENT PRESENT OTHER PARENT JOSEPH GONZALEZ PRESENT CONT TO 01/18/12 @ 8:30 IN D-14 FOR FYI
Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
January 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing ORD AFT HEARING Notes: OF 1/18/11 |
|
January 24, 2011 | Docket Event | RECEIVED* Notes: ORDER AFTER HEARING FROM YOLO COUNTY DCSS | |
January 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order: Modification DCSS PATRICK WARD DEFENDANT CHILD SUPPORT ORDER AGAINST MOTHER IS TERMINATED AS OF 1/1/11 FOR CHILDREN JOSEPH AND JOHN. THE COUNTY MAY BRING A MOTION AGAINST FATHER IN THIS CASE IF HE IS OBLIGOR. Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
December 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
*Motion NTC OF MOTION* Notes: NOTICE OF MOTION RE MODIFICATION OF CHILD SUPPORT (FILED BY DCSS ATTY, PATRICK R WARD) |
|
December 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FILE-AWAY |
|
December 10, 2010 | Docket Event | ISSUE: CHILD SUPPORT Notes: CHILD SUPPORT | |
July 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing ORD AFT HEARING Notes: FROM CT DATE OF 06/23/09 IN DEPT 12 - DEFT ORDERED TO PAY $105.00 PER MO, BEGINNING 06/01/09 ($39.00 FOR JOSEPH V GONZALEZ AND $66.00 FOR JOHN A GONZALEZ); THE LOW INCOME ADJUSTMENT APPLIES; THE OTHER PARENT, JOSEPH GONZALEZ (OBLIGEE), TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN HEALTH INSURANCE COVERAGE FOR THE CHILDREN; JOINDER OF FATHER, JOSEPH GONZALEZ (OTHER PARENT); AS PREVIOUSLY ORDERED, EACH PARENT SHALL COMPLY W/ FC SECTION 4063 RE HEALTH CARE COSTS REIMBURSEMENT PROCEDURES AND SHALL PAY THEIR RESPECTIVE ONE-HALF SHARE OF UNINSURED HEALTH CARE COSTS INCURRED FOR THE MINOR CHILDREN. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.