Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Smith, Stella, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Smith, Steven D, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Judge, Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2005 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Cycle Time137 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Review MR ROTH APPEARED AND REPORTED PARTIES RECONCILED CASE TO BE DISMISSED Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
April 26, 2005 | Docket Event |
Stipulation STIP AND ORDER Notes: STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY RESPONDENT STEVEN D. SMITH |
|
April 13, 2005 | Docket Event |
Findings & Order After Hearing FIND & ORD AFT HRG Notes: FINDINGS & ORDER AFTER HEARING - 3-15-05 FILED BY RESPONDENT STEVEN D. SMITH |
|
April 12, 2005 | Docket Event |
Response - No Fee RESPONSE* Notes: TO THE PETITION |
|
March 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause OSC: CHILD & SPOUSAL SUPPORT PETITIONER PRESENT W/ATTY ROTH RESPONDENT PRESENT W/ATTY HAHN PARTIES OWN ALMOND RANCH BOTH NOT WORKIN AT THIS TIMEATTY ROTH REQUESTS RANCH BE SOLD, COURT ORDERS RANCH BE EVALUATED; MONEY FOR EVALUATION TO COME OUT OF COMMUNITY FUND; PETITIONER'S DRAW FROM FUND $1500.PLUS TITUTION FOR SCHOOL; COURT RESERVED RIGHT TO COLLECT CHILD & SPOUSAL SUPPORT; MINOR'S SCHOOL TITUTION WILL BE SPLIT BETWEEN PARTIES; MINOR'S TRIP TO SPAIN TO BE PAID OUT OF COMMUNITY FUND; PARTIES TO COOPERATE WITH CPA WHICH IS ALSO TO BE PAID OUT OF COMMUNITY FUND; FUNDS MAY BE USED OUT OF COMMUNITY FUND TO PLANT TREES; COURT EXTENDED RTO, CONTINUED MATTER TO 6-14-05 8:30AM IN DEPT 11, COUNSEL TO PREPARE FORMAL ORDER Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
March 08, 2005 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAILING* Notes: FINDINGS AND ORDER AFTER HEARING - 3-2-05 - STEVEN D. SMITH |
|
March 08, 2005 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: STEVEN D. SMITH - 2-12-05 - SUMMONS, PETITION |
|
March 01, 2005 | Docket Event |
Findings & Order After Hearing FIND & ORD AFT HRG Notes: FINDINGS & ORDER AFTER HEARING - 3-1-05 FILED BY PETITIONER STELLA SMITH |
|
March 01, 2005 | Docket Event | CONSOLIDATED Notes: CONSOLIDATED; LEAD CASE IS CV-FL-05-133 WITH CV-F3-05-158 | |
March 01, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause CHILD SUPPORT; SPOUSAL SUPPORT; FARM MANAGEMENT THIS CASE WAS MADE THE DOMINANT FILE FL-05-133 CV-F3-5-158 WAS CONSOLIDATED INTO THIS FILE PETITONER TOOK $10,000.00 AND $5000.00 SO THE BALANCE OF ACCOUNT SHOULD BE $45,000.00 FATHER ACTED INAPPROPRIATELY DURING VISITATION DISCUSSED FINANCIAL MATTERS. HAS PEOPLE V SMITH CRIMINAL MATTER WITH NTA IN EARLY APRIL. TEST RESULTS FOR STEVEN = POSITIVE FOR COCAINE FOR STELLA NEGATIVE RESULTS. PETITIONER HAS CARBONS OF CHECKS WRITTEN APPROX 1/26/05 NO BANK STATEMENT PROVIDED ANY MONEY MUST GO INTO TRUST FOR DAY TO DAY OPERATION AND PAYMENTS TO RESPONDENT'S COUNSEL ETC. PARTIES ARE TO SHARE 3/1/05 TUITION PAYMENT TAXES ARE TO BE TAKEN TO JOHN CARBAJAL PROPERTY TO BE PUT ON MARKET COURT DEFERRED PROPERTY ON THE MARKET ISSUE; 02/03/04 TAX RETURNS AND CHILD SUPPORT UNTIL 3/15/05 RESPONDEND TO PROVIDE JANUARY 05, FEBRUARY 05 AND DECEMBER 04 BANK STATEMENTS 3/15/05 RESPONDENT TO HIRE PRIVATE COUNSEL 0SC RE: PROPERTY; TAX RETURNS; CHILD SUPPORT BANK STATEMENTS. 3/15/05 8:30 A.M. DEPT 11 JG Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.