Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wheeler, Pamela L, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Wheeler, Rick E, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Warriner, Thomas presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 27, 2005 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 26, 2006 | Docket Event |
Filed STIPULATED* Notes: STIPULATED ORDER FOR MODIFICATION OF CHILD SUPPORT FILED BY PETITIONER PAMELA L. WHEELER (THOMPSON) |
|
June 23, 2006 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FILE AWAY |
|
June 23, 2006 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney SUBST OF ATTORNEY Notes: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY RICK E. WHEELER SUBSTITUTES SELF AS ATTORNEY IN PLACE OF LISA WIBLE WRIGHT |
|
June 01, 2006 | Docket Event |
*Motion PER JAN AT BILL KOPPERS OFFICE Judge: Petre, Donna M |
|
May 31, 2006 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FILE AWAY BIN |
|
May 31, 2006 | Docket Event | RECEIVED* Notes: CONFIRMING FAX TO TAKE JUNE 1,2006 OFF CALENDAR, PARTIES REACHED AN AGREEMENT | |
March 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
Change of Address NTC CHANGE/ADDRESS Notes: OF COUNSEL LISA WIBLE WRIGHT 900 UNIVERSITY AVENUE, SUITE 101, SACRAMENTO, CA 95825 |
|
March 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FILE AWAY |
|
March 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAILING* Notes: SERVED: JORDAN K. ATZEFF; STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING AND ORDER THEREON (ENDORSED FILED); 3/17/06 |
|
March 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
*Motion
Judge: Petre, Donna M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.