Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Yolo, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with McAdam, Samuel presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 31, 2004 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions106 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time125 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
Vacated DROPPED FROM CAL |
|
June 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RESPONDENT PRESENT RESPOINDENT IS REFERRED TO SELF HELP TO FILE AN PARENTAGE ACTION CASE. THIS CASE WAS DISMISSED Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
June 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FAMILY FILE AWAY |
|
June 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: NICOLE HUTH WITH FL300, FL310, MC031 ON 5/26/ 11. |
|
May 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FILE-AWAY |
|
May 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAILING* Notes: MAILED: FL-300, FL-310, AND MC-031, TO: NICOLE HUTH, ON 05/26/11 |
|
May 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FILE AWAY |
|
May 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
Issue: Child Custody ISSUE: CHILD CUST. |
|
May 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause OSC* Notes: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR MODIFICATION OF CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATION, FILED BY BRIAN MARTIN |
|
November 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FILE-AWAY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.