Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Flanders, Teresa, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Judge, Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 24, 2004 |
CategoryDv Prevention With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time328 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 18, 2005 | Docket Event |
General Close CLOSE CASE |
|
July 18, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause NO APPEARANCE BY PETITIONER Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
April 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
Civil Harassment TRO TEMP RESTRAINING ORD Notes: AGAINST RICKY DALE REESE, JR. EXPIRES 7/18/05 |
|
January 19, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause OSC/TRO (DV) PETITIONER PRESENT W/SADVC ADVOCATE JACOBSEN RESPONDENT NOT PRESENT COURT CONTINUED TEMP RTO CONT TO/FOR: 7-18-05 8:30AM OSC/TRO DEPT 11 Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
January 18, 2005 | Docket Event | FILED* Notes: RECEIPT FROM RICKY REESE, JR. YOLO COUNTY PROBATION DEPARTMENT PROGRAM REFERRAL FORM. | |
January 18, 2005 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL* Notes: OF RICKY REESE, JR. RE ATTENDANCE FOR HEARING 1/19/05(FATHER VERY ILL & IN HOSPITAL) |
|
August 25, 2004 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause PETITIONER PRESENT RESPONDENT PRESENT TEMPORARY ORDER REMAINS CONTINUED TO/FOR: 1-19-05 8:30AM OSC DEPT 11 Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
August 25, 2004 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: calendar basket |
|
August 25, 2004 | Docket Event |
Civil Harassment TRO TEMP RESTRAINING ORD Notes: TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING |
|
August 24, 2004 | Docket Event |
Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order APP/DECL OSC/TRO-DV |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.