Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bury, Craig D, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Bury, Jacquelyn, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Judge, Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 18, 2004 |
CategoryDissolution Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time496 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 27, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment NTC ENTRY JDGM - FL |
|
December 27, 2005 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL* Notes: FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DIVORCE |
|
December 13, 2005 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Personal Appearance APPEAR/STIP/WAIVER |
|
July 11, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Review REVIEW ATTY BLAKE PRESENT, COUNSEL REQUEST DROP ON CONDITIONCASE CAN BE SET IN TWO WEEKS NOTICE IF NECESSARY, COURT GRANTED COUNSEL'S REQUEST Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
May 03, 2005 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL* Notes: DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE - RESPONDENT JACQUELYN BURY |
|
February 09, 2005 | Docket Event |
Findings & Order After Hearing FIND & ORD AFT HRG Notes: FINDINGS & ORDER AFTER HEARING - 12-16-04 FILED BY PETITIONER CRAIG D. BURY |
|
December 16, 2004 | Docket Event |
*Review REVIEW: HOUSE SITUTATION; INFERRING MINIMUM WAGE INCOME TO RESPONDENT IF NO JOB PETITONER PRESENT W/ATTY RYAN RESPONDENT PRESENT W/ATTY BLAKE STIPULATION REACHED, CURRENT SUPPORT ORDER REMAINS; PETITIONER WILL MAKE HOUSE PMT AND RECEIVE CREDIT TOWARDS SPOUSAL SUPPORT; NO SALES OF COMMUNITY STOCK TO TAKE PLACE; ATTY FEES DEFERRED CONTINUIED FOR REVIEW TO 7-11-05 8:30AM IN DEPT 11 Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
December 15, 2004 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: DEPT 11 VIA BOX IN CIVIL |
|
December 15, 2004 | Docket Event |
Income & Expense Declaration INC & EXP DECL Notes: OF RESPONDENT |
|
October 19, 2004 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing ORD AFT HEARING Notes: 9/28/04 8:30 am Dept 11 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.