Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ponce, Maria Dejesus, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Martinez, Javier Ponce De, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Warriner, Thomas presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 20, 2002 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions193 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time203 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 24, 2005 | Docket Event |
Findings & Order After Hearing FIND & ORD AFT HRG Notes: FINDINGS & ORDER AFTER HEARING RE HEARING OF 10/12/05 RE: CHILD CUSTODY & VISITATION. CUSTODY LEGAL & PHYSICAL TO MOTHER. VISITATION PER ADOPTED REPORT OF COURT CLINICIAN DONALD SIGGINS DATED OCT. 10,1005 |
|
October 24, 2005 | Docket Event | RELATED CASE FILES Notes: UFC - RELATED CASE FILES F302-1421 | |
April 11, 2005 | Docket Event |
FYI - RELATED CASE ON CALENDAR F3 02-1421
Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
March 11, 2004 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: SHELF |
|
March 11, 2004 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF W/DRAWL ATTY Notes: ATTORNEY LESLIE KNIGHT WITHDRAWS AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR PETITIONER MARIA DE JESUS PONCE |
|
February 26, 2004 | Docket Event |
Stipulation STIP AND ORDER Notes: STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING PARENTING TIME SIGNED AND FILED |
|
December 02, 2003 | Docket Event |
Stipulation STIP AND ORDER Notes: STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING PARENTING TIME FILED BY PETITIONER MARIA DE JESUS PONCE |
|
October 29, 2003 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: ATTY BIN |
|
October 29, 2003 | Docket Event |
Stipulation STIP AND ORDER Notes: STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: PARENTING TIME |
|
October 27, 2003 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC UNAVAIL COUNSEL Notes: UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL LESLIE KNIGHT FROM 11/7/03 TO 11/18/03 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.