Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Pena, Esther, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Pena, Gustavo, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Warriner, Thomas presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWarriner, Thomas Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2003 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time386 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
*Motion PETITIONER PRESENT; COUNSEL FOR RESPONDENT PRESENT. PARTIES REACHED A STIPULATION; COUNSEL TO PREPARE AND SUBMIT TO THE COURT FOR SIGNATURE. Judge: Petre, Donna M |
|
June 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: CALENDAR FILE AWAY |
|
June 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
*Motion NTC OF MOTION* Notes: NOTICE OF MOTION RE PROPERTY |
|
August 08, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Review RETURN LONG TERM MEDIATION PETITIONER PRESENT RESPONDENT PRESENT COURT ACK DR. SIGGINS REPORT, ADOPTED SAID REPORT BY AGREEMENT OF PARTIES. Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
June 01, 2005 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order - No Fee STIP REF TO MEDIATE Notes: STIPULATION REFERRING TO MEDIATION & ORDER |
|
June 01, 2005 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order STIP/ORD AFT MEDIATE Notes: STIPULATION & ORDER AFTER MEDIATION |
|
June 01, 2005 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause OSC: MODIF CUSTODY & VISITATION PETITIONER PRESENT RESPONDENT PRESENT W/ATTY BEURY PARTIES REFERRED TO MEDIATION THIS MORNING W/SIGGINS STIP REACHED AND ADOPTED; COURT REFERRED PARTIES TO LONG TERM MEDIATION W/SIGGINS; PARTIES TO SPLIT COSTSCONT TO/FOR: 8-8-05 8:30AM REV DEPT 11 Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
May 27, 2005 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: PPS FORWARDED TO DEPT 11 |
|
May 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: GUSTAVO PENA W/OSC ON 5/24/05 |
|
May 24, 2005 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause OSC* Notes: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE MODIFICATION OF CHILD CUSTODY;VISITATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.